President:Flavio Roda
Secretary:Loretta Piroia
Indirizzo:Via Giovanni Battista Piranesi, 46, 20137 Milano
Phone:+39 02 75731
Fax:+39 02 7573368
Url:www.fisi.org
History of FISI
Costitution
The Italian Union of Ski Clubs (USCI) was founded in Turin, in 1908, by Paolo Kind, uniting three clubs. Paolo Kind, who became its president, was son of the Adolfo who was responsible for the introduction and popularisation of skiing in Italy and who, on 21 December 1901, had formed the Turin Ski Club. The organisation did not last long and was replaced on 23 October 1913 by a new organisation, the Italian Ski Federation, established in Milan and presided over by Gustavo Engelman. Although this initiative was not very successful and was re-launched on 10 October 1920 by Alberto Bonacossa, who was also the first president, with the establishment in Milan of the Italian Federation of Skiing (FIS). In 1933, with the takeover of skating and ice hockey as well as bobsleigh (skeleton), the name was changed to Italian Winter Sports Federation (FISI). In 1933, with the takeover of skating and ice hockey as well as bobsleigh and skeleton, the name was changed to Italian Winter Sports Federation (FISI). In 1946 the two disciplines on ice finally left the FISI and formed two separate associations. They were reunited later in the Italian Federation of Ice Sports (FISG). The Federation is listed in Law no. 426 of 16/02/1942.
Denomination
Became Federazione Italiana dello Sci (FIS or “Italian Federation of Skiing”) in 1920, assumed its present name in 1933.
Federal Office
The Italian Union of Ski Clubs, from 1908 until its dissolution, in Turin; from 1913 to 1918, the Italian Ski Federation was based in Milan; from 1920 it had two-year rotation between Turin, Milan and Venice; from 1929 in Rome the subsequent Italian Winter Sport Federation, in 1933, in Milan.
First National Championships
1909, cross-country skiing and jumping; 1930, bobsleigh; 1931, alpine skiing; 1966, luge.
First appearance at the Olympic Games
1924 Paris.
Presidents
ITALIAN UNION OF SKI CLUBS
1908 -1910 Paolo Kind
SKI FEDERATION
1913 -1918 Gustavo Engelmann
ITALIAN FEDERATION OF SKIING
1920 -1922 Earl Aldo Bonacossa
1922 -1924 Mario Corti
1924 -1926 Gino Ravà
1926 -1927 Guido Bertarelli
1927 -1929 Aldo Bonacossa
1929 -1930 Hon. Augusto Turati
1920 -1933 Renato Ricci
ITALIAN WINTER SPORTS FEDERATION
1934 -1945 Renato Ricci
1944 Giuseppe Sabelli Fioretti
1944 Vincenzo La Porta
1945 -1946 Luigi Flumiani
1946 -1948 Gianni Nasi
1948 -1949 Pio Antonio Caliari
1949 -1964 Piero Oneglio
1964 -1970 Fabio Conci
1970 -1976 Omero Vaghi
1976 -1987 Arrigo Gattai
1987 -1988 Omero Vaghi
1988 - 2000 Carlo Valentino
2000 - 2007 (18 January) Gaetano Coppi
2007 (24 January - 14 April) Riccardo Agabio
2007 (14 April) - 2011 Giovanni Morzenti
2011 - 2012 Franco Carraro
2012 (31 March) Flavio Roda
Secretaries
1909 - Mario C. Santi
1920 - Adolfo Corti
1920 - 1923 G. Vassalli
1923 - 1924 Giuseppe Guidini
1924 - 1926 Francesco Guarneri
1926 - 1927 Luigi Flumiani
1927 - 1929 Gaetano De Luca
1929 - 1945 Romolo Giacomini
1945 - 1950 Giordano Bruno Fabjan
1951 - 1968 Cesare Bonvini
1968 - 1989 Angelo Vergani
1989 - 1991 Giorgio Ghersina
1991 - 2001 Roberto Contento
2001 - 2004 Gian Piero Aquino
2004 - 2006 Gianni Storti
2007 - 2008 Leonardo Costanzo
2008 - 2013 Fausto Cartasegna
2013 - 2014 Enrico Negretti
2014 - 2015 Luigi Monterisi
2018 - Loretta Piroia